Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORTUNE CONSULTANTS FOR ELEVATORS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 03 Nov, 2004 | Yes | Active |
FUJI ELEVATORS AND ESCALATORS (INDIA) LIMITED | Director | 27 Feb, 2006 | Yes | Active |
INFOTRONICS & COMPU-CONTROLS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 27 Feb, 2006 | Yes | Active |
LIFT INSTITUUT (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 12 Jun, 2009 | - | Active |
VINAY VENKAT URBANHABITAT PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 03 Jun, 2009 | - | Active |
ABOV LIFTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 04 Jul, 2016 | - | Resigned |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||